Assembly | 08/13/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2013 | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1162.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1019.) (May 23). | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2013 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 642.) (April 23). | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |