Assembly
|
05/21/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1107.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1019.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 755.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 661.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|