Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3032.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 20. Page 2940.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 607.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 389.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|