LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB744
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB744
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB744
Compare Versions
SB744 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB744 Amended September 3, 2013
SB744 Amended August 19, 2013
SB744 Amended June 18, 2013
SB744 Amended May 28, 2013
SB744 Amended May 14, 2013
SB744 Amended May 8, 2013
SB744 Amended April 24, 2013
SB744 Amended April 10, 2013
SB744 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB744 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB744 Amended September 3, 2013
SB744 Amended August 19, 2013
SB744 Amended June 18, 2013
SB744 Amended May 28, 2013
SB744 Amended May 14, 2013
SB744 Amended May 8, 2013
SB744 Amended April 24, 2013
SB744 Amended April 10, 2013
SB744 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare