LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB745
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB745
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB745
Compare Versions
SB745 Chaptered August 27, 2013
SB745 Enrolled August 16, 2013
SB745 Amended August 5, 2013
SB745 Amended June 25, 2013
SB745 Amended June 11, 2013
SB745 Amended April 15, 2013
SB745 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB745 Chaptered August 27, 2013
SB745 Enrolled August 16, 2013
SB745 Amended August 5, 2013
SB745 Amended June 25, 2013
SB745 Amended June 11, 2013
SB745 Amended April 15, 2013
SB745 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare