Senate
|
02/03/2014
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2014
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2599.) (January 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2014
|
Set for hearing January 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|