LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB755
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB755
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB755
Compare Versions
SB755 Enrolled September 19, 2013
SB755 Amended September 6, 2013
SB755 Amended September 3, 2013
SB755 Amended August 21, 2013
SB755 Amended June 27, 2013
SB755 Amended May 7, 2013
SB755 Amended April 3, 2013
SB755 Amended April 1, 2013
SB755 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB755 Enrolled September 19, 2013
SB755 Amended September 6, 2013
SB755 Amended September 3, 2013
SB755 Amended August 21, 2013
SB755 Amended June 27, 2013
SB755 Amended May 7, 2013
SB755 Amended April 3, 2013
SB755 Amended April 1, 2013
SB755 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare