California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB758 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 10/05/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SB 758CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 606 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 5, 2013 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 5, 2013 PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 3, 2013 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 30, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 5, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 7, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 23, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 1, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Block FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to add and repeal Section 65302.11 of the Government Code, relating to land use. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 758, Block. General plans: City of Coronado. The State Aeronautics Act governs the creation and operation of airports in this state. The act provides for the establishment of county airport land use commissions to carry out various requirements, including the formulation of a comprehensive land use compatibility plan to provide for the orderly growth of airports and the area surrounding airports within the jurisdiction of the commission, and to safeguard the general welfare of the inhabitants within the vicinity of an airport and the public in general. The act requires each county in which there is an airport served by a scheduled airline, with certain exceptions, to establish an airport land use commission. The act requires the commission to include, within its airport land use compatibility plan, the area within the jurisdiction of the commission surrounding any military airport for specified purposes. Existing law exempts the County of San Diego from the requirement to establish a commission and, instead, makes the San Diego County Regional Airport Authority responsible for the preparation, adoption, and amendment of an airport land use compatibility plan for each airport in San Diego County. The Planning and Zoning Law requires the legislative body of a city or county to adopt a comprehensive, long-term general plan that includes various elements, including, among others, a circulation safety element consisting of the general location and extent of existing and proposed major thoroughfares, including military airports. This law requires the general plan, and any applicable specific plan, to be amended within 180 days of any amendment to the airport land use compatibility plan. This bill would, until January 1, 2017, instead require the general plan, and any applicable specific plan, for the City of Coronado to be amended, as necessary, within 540 days of any amendment to the airport land use compatibility plan. The bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for the City of Coronado. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 65302.11 is added to the Government Code, to read: 65302.11. (a) Notwithstanding subdivision (b) of Section 65302.3, the general plan, and any applicable specific plan, for the City of Coronado shall be amended, as necessary, within 540 days of any amendment to the plan required under Section 21675 of the Public Utilities Code if the amendment is made prior to January 1, 2017. (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019, or 540 days after an amendment to the plan required under Section 21675 of the Public Utilities Code, whichever is earlier, and as of that date is repealed. SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that a special law is necessary and that a general law cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the unique island location of the City of Coronado and its proximity to large military installations. In addition, the complexities of amending a general plan and a local coastal plan for the City of Coronado will take significantly longer than six months.