LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB76
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB76
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB76
Compare Versions
SB76 Chaptered June 27, 2013
SB76 Enrolled June 14, 2013
SB76 Amended June 13, 2013
SB76 Amended June 12, 2013
SB76 Introduced January 10, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB76 Chaptered June 27, 2013
SB76 Enrolled June 14, 2013
SB76 Amended June 13, 2013
SB76 Amended June 12, 2013
SB76 Introduced January 10, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare