Assembly | 01/23/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2637.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2014 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing January 21. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2590.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2014 | Set for hearing January 14. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |