Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2550.) Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1157.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1020.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 751.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|