|
06/28/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 46, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1995.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 863.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 758.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|