LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB771
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB771
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB771
Compare Versions
SB771 Chaptered August 27, 2013
SB771 Enrolled August 16, 2013
SB771 Amended June 5, 2013
SB771 Amended April 1, 2013
SB771 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB771 Chaptered August 27, 2013
SB771 Enrolled August 16, 2013
SB771 Amended June 5, 2013
SB771 Amended April 1, 2013
SB771 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare