Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 8. Page 2665.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2645.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 792.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|