California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB782 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill July 2, 2014
Bill January 17, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014
Bill May 7, 2013