LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB792
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB792
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB792
Compare Versions
SB792 Enrolled September 5, 2014
SB792 Amended August 30, 2014
SB792 Amended August 22, 2014
SB792 Amended June 30, 2014
SB792 Amended May 19, 2014
SB792 Amended January 27, 2014
SB792 Amended January 13, 2014
SB792 Amended May 14, 2013
SB792 Amended April 22, 2013
SB792 Amended April 10, 2013
SB792 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB792 Enrolled September 5, 2014
SB792 Amended August 30, 2014
SB792 Amended August 22, 2014
SB792 Amended June 30, 2014
SB792 Amended May 19, 2014
SB792 Amended January 27, 2014
SB792 Amended January 13, 2014
SB792 Amended May 14, 2013
SB792 Amended April 22, 2013
SB792 Amended April 10, 2013
SB792 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare