Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2013 | Set for hearing June 26. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Set for hearing May 1. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |