Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. (Introduced measure version corrected February 13.) | ||
Senate | 01/10/2013 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 12/04/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. | ||
Senate | 12/03/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |