|
10/04/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 569, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2138.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 2835.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2794.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 976.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 760.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|