|
08/27/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2485.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 868.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 696.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|