California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB809 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 26, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill May 14, 2013
Bill May 1, 2013