Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |