|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 289, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2673.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 775.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 618.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|