California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB822 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2013

Amended

Bill August 19, 2013
Bill June 12, 2013
Bill April 22, 2013