|
07/10/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/10/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5705.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3145.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2014
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2927.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2014
|
Set for hearing March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|