|
09/30/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2014
|
In Senate. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 5018.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6755.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5998.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 3783.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3703.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3233.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|