|
07/07/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4145.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5548.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3046.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2978.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|