LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB837
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB837
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB837
Compare Versions
SB837 Amended August 4, 2014
SB837 Amended July 2, 2014
SB837 Amended June 18, 2014
SB837 Amended May 28, 2014
SB837 Amended April 22, 2014
SB837 Amended April 2, 2014
SB837 Introduced January 6, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB837 Amended August 4, 2014
SB837 Amended July 2, 2014
SB837 Amended June 18, 2014
SB837 Amended May 28, 2014
SB837 Amended April 22, 2014
SB837 Amended April 2, 2014
SB837 Introduced January 6, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare