Senate | 04/30/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2014 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |