|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 920, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4872.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6416.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6284.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3656.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3703.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2014
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2927.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2014
|
Set for hearing March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|