LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB846
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB846
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB846
Compare Versions
SB846 Chaptered September 18, 2014
SB846 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB846 Amended August 14, 2014
SB846 Amended July 3, 2014
SB846 Amended May 28, 2014
SB846 Amended February 25, 2014
SB846 Introduced January 9, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB846 Chaptered September 18, 2014
SB846 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB846 Amended August 14, 2014
SB846 Amended July 3, 2014
SB846 Amended May 28, 2014
SB846 Amended February 25, 2014
SB846 Introduced January 9, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare