Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3093.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |