Senate | 05/27/2014 | Senate refused to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 1. Noes 33. Page 3614.) | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 5067.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2014 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 4989.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2014 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3130.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |