06/20/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2014. | |||
06/20/2014 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/19/2014 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3911.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2014 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 5527.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5527.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5530.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2014 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3131.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |