LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB863
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB863
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB863
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 9, 2014
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
June 19, 2014
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
June 20, 2014
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 16, 2014
Compare
Bill
June 13, 2014
Compare
Bill
June 12, 2014
Compare