California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB873 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill August 27, 2014
Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 12, 2014