Assembly | 08/28/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 10.) (August 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6380.) | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2014 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 6332.) Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 10.) (August 14). | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2014 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5975.) | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2014 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3136.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |