LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB875
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB875
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB875
Compare Versions
SB875 Chaptered September 27, 2014
SB875 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB875 Amended August 13, 2014
SB875 Amended August 12, 2014
SB875 Introduced January 9, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB875 Chaptered September 27, 2014
SB875 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB875 Amended August 13, 2014
SB875 Amended August 12, 2014
SB875 Introduced January 9, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare