|
09/27/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 687, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4986.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 6710.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 23. Noes 1.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5975.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3137.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|