California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB883 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill August 30, 2014
Bill August 22, 2014