LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB895
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB895
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB895
Compare Versions
SB895 Chaptered September 28, 2014
SB895 Enrolled August 29, 2014
SB895 Amended August 22, 2014
SB895 Amended August 18, 2014
SB895 Amended June 24, 2014
SB895 Amended May 27, 2014
SB895 Amended April 23, 2014
SB895 Amended March 26, 2014
SB895 Amended February 14, 2014
SB895 Introduced January 13, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB895 Chaptered September 28, 2014
SB895 Enrolled August 29, 2014
SB895 Amended August 22, 2014
SB895 Amended August 18, 2014
SB895 Amended June 24, 2014
SB895 Amended May 27, 2014
SB895 Amended April 23, 2014
SB895 Amended March 26, 2014
SB895 Amended February 14, 2014
SB895 Introduced January 13, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare