Assembly | 07/03/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. (Page 2276.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2277.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2188.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 896.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |