Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2014 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3403.) (May 6). | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3120.) (April 8). | ||
Senate | 03/20/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2014 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2014 | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S., JUD., and APPR. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |