|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 571, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 13. Page 6125.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 3412.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3277.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3091.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2014
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|