Assembly | 06/23/2014 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3595.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3704.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3038.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |