LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB915
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB915
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB915
Compare Versions
SB915 Chaptered August 22, 2014
SB915 Enrolled August 12, 2014
SB915 Amended June 30, 2014
SB915 Amended June 19, 2014
SB915 Amended April 21, 2014
SB915 Introduced January 27, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB915 Chaptered August 22, 2014
SB915 Enrolled August 12, 2014
SB915 Amended June 30, 2014
SB915 Amended June 19, 2014
SB915 Amended April 21, 2014
SB915 Introduced January 27, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare