Senate | 05/28/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3310.) | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. (Corrected March 21.) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Set for hearing March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2014 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.Q. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |