Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2014 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3312.) (April 29). | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |