Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3595.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3704.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3310.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 1. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|