LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB923
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB923
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB923
Compare Versions
SB923 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB923 Amended August 18, 2014
SB923 Amended June 17, 2014
SB923 Amended May 27, 2014
SB923 Amended April 9, 2014
SB923 Amended March 26, 2014
SB923 Introduced January 29, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB923 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB923 Amended August 18, 2014
SB923 Amended June 17, 2014
SB923 Amended May 27, 2014
SB923 Amended April 9, 2014
SB923 Amended March 26, 2014
SB923 Introduced January 29, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare